Docket for 20-1040
 | | No. 20-1040
| Title: | Michael Aaron Strickland, Petitioner v. Oregon | Docketed: | January 29, 2021 | | | Lower Ct: | Court of Appeals of Oregon | Case Numbers: | (A165019) | Decision Date: | April 1, 2020 | Rehearing Denied: | | Discretionary Court Decision Date: | August 27, 2020 | | | |
|
Jan 26 2021 | Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due March 1, 2021) | | PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | Feb 05 2021 | Waiver of State of Oregon of right to respond not accepted for filing. (February 09, 2021) | | | Feb 05 2021 | Waiver of right of respondent State of Oregon to respond filed. | | Main Document | Feb 17 2021 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 3/5/2021. | | | Mar 08 2021 | Petition DENIED. | | |
|