Docket for 20-1033
|
Jan 14 2021 | Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due March 1, 2021) | | PetitionCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | Feb 25 2021 | Waiver of right of respondent Compañía de Inversiones Mercantiles, S.A. to respond filed. | | Main Document | Mar 03 2021 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 3/19/2021. | | | Mar 15 2021 | Response Requested. (Due April 14, 2021) | | | Mar 17 2021 | Motion to extend the time to file a response from April 14, 2021 to May 14, 2021, submitted to The Clerk. | | Main Document | Mar 18 2021 | Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including May 14, 2021. | | | May 14 2021 | Brief of respondent Compañía de Inversiones Mercantiles, S.A. in opposition filed. | | Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | Jun 01 2021 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/17/2021. | | | Jun 01 2021 | Reply of petitioners Grupo Cementos de Chihuahua, S.A.B. de C.V., et al. filed. (Distributed) | | Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | Jun 21 2021 | Petition DENIED. | | |
|