Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 19-6291
RSS Feed Print Notify Me
Search documents in this case:
No. 19-6291
Title:Josephat Mua, Petitioner
v.
The O'Neal Firm, LLP
Docketed:October 17, 2019
Linked with 19A120
Lower Ct:District of Columbia Court of Appeals
   Case Numbers:(19-DA-8)
   Decision Date:May 9, 2019
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Jul 28 2019Application (19A120) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from August 7, 2019 to October 6, 2019, submitted to The Chief Justice.
Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsProof of Service
Aug 13 2019Application (19A120) granted by The Chief Justice extending the time to file until October 6, 2019.
Oct 06 2019Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due November 18, 2019)
Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma PauperisPetitionAppendixProof of Service
Dec 05 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/10/2020.
Jan 13 2020The motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis is denied, and the petition for a writ of certiorari is dismissed. See Rule 39.8. As the petitioner has repeatedly abused this Court's process, the Clerk is directed not to accept any further petitions in noncriminal matters from petitioner unless the docketing fee required by Rule 38(a) is paid and the petition is submitted in compliance with Rule 33.1. See Martin v. District of Columbia Court of Appeals, 506 U. S. 1 (1992) (per curiam).

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Josephat Mua2332 London Bridge Drive
Silver Spring, MD 20906

(301) 919-4939
Party name: Josephat Mua

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543