Docket for 19-522
 | | No. 19-522
| Title: | Trading Technologies International, Inc., Petitioner v. IBG LLC, et al. | Docketed: | October 22, 2019 | Linked with 19A171 | | Lower Ct: | United States Court of Appeals for the Federal Circuit | Case Numbers: | (2018-1105, 2018-1302, 2018-1438, 2018-1443) | Decision Date: | May 21, 2019 | Rehearing Denied: | | Discretionary Court Decision Date: | | | | |
|
Aug 07 2019 | Application (19A171) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from August 19, 2019 to October 18, 2019, submitted to The Chief Justice. | | Main Document | Aug 13 2019 | Application (19A171) granted by The Chief Justice extending the time to file until October 18, 2019. | | | Oct 18 2019 | Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due November 21, 2019) | | PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | Nov 13 2019 | Motion of the Solicitor General to extend the time to file a response from November 21, 2019 to December 23, 2019, submitted to The Clerk. | | Main Document | Nov 14 2019 | Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including December 23, 2019, for all respondents. | | | Dec 20 2019 | Brief of respondent United States in opposition filed. | | Main DocumentCertificate of Word Count | Jan 06 2020 | Reply of petitioner Trading Technologies International, Inc. filed. | | Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | Jan 08 2020 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/24/2020. | | | Jan 27 2020 | Petition DENIED. | | |
|