Docket for 19-1385
 | | No. 19-1385
| Title: | Kristina Box, Commissioner, Indiana Department of Health, Petitioner v. Ashlee Henderson, et al. | Docketed: | June 17, 2020 | | | Lower Ct: | United States Court of Appeals for the Seventh Circuit | Case Numbers: | (17-1141) | Decision Date: | January 17, 2020 | Rehearing Denied: | | Discretionary Court Decision Date: | | | | |
|
Jun 15 2020 | Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due July 17, 2020) | | PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | Jun 23 2020 | Waiver of right of respondent Ashlee and Ruby Henderson, et al. to respond filed. | | Main Document | Jul 01 2020 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 9/29/2020. | | | Sep 28 2020 | Response Requested. (Due October 28, 2020) | | | Oct 09 2020 | Motion to extend the time to file a response from October 28, 2020 to November 10, 2020, submitted to The Clerk. | | Main Document | Oct 13 2020 | Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including November 10, 2020. | | | Oct 28 2020 | Brief amicus curiae of Them Before Us filed. | | Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | Nov 10 2020 | Brief of respondents Ashlee and Ruby Henderson, et al. in opposition filed. | | Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count | Nov 23 2020 | Reply of petitioner Kristina Box, In Her Official Capacity as Commissioner, Indiana State Department of Health filed. (Distributed) | | Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count | Nov 24 2020 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 12/11/2020. | | | Dec 14 2020 | Petition DENIED. | | |
|