Docket for 19-1378
 | | No. 19-1378
| Title: | Phazzer Electronics, Inc., Petitioner v. Taser International, Inc. | Docketed: | June 16, 2020 | | | Lower Ct: | United States Court of Appeals for the Federal Circuit | Case Numbers: | (2018-1914) | Decision Date: | July 23, 2019 | Rehearing Denied: | August 23, 2019 | Discretionary Court Decision Date: | | | | |
|
Jun 08 2020 | Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due July 16, 2020) | | PetitionCertificate of Word CountProof of ServiceAppendix | Jul 15 2020 | Informal Response of Taser International, Inc., not accepted for filing. (July 17, 2020) | | | Jul 17 2020 | Waiver of right of respondent Taser International, Inc. to respond filed. | | Main Document | Jul 22 2020 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 9/29/2020. | | | Aug 05 2020 | Response Requested. (Due September 4, 2020) | | | Sep 04 2020 | Brief of respondent Taser International, Inc., in opposition filed. | | Main DocumentOtherCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | Sep 18 2020 | Reply of petitioner Phazzer Electroinics, Inc. filed. (Distributed) | | Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | Sep 23 2020 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/9/2020. | | | Oct 05 2020 | Supplemental brief of respondent Taser International, Inc., filed. (Distributed) | | Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | Oct 08 2020 | Supplemental brief of petitioner Phazzer Electroinics, Inc. filed. | | Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | Oct 13 2020 | Petition DENIED. | | |
|