Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 19-1152
RSS Feed Print Notify Me
Search documents in this case:
No. 19-1152
Title:ISL Loan Trust, et al., Petitioners
v.
Millennium Lab Holdings II, LLC, et al.
Docketed:March 20, 2020
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Third Circuit
   Case Numbers:(18-3210)
   Decision Date:December 19, 2019
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Mar 18 2020Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due April 20, 2020)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Apr 20 2020Waiver of right of respondents TA Millennium, Inc. and TA Associates Management, L.P. to respond filed.
Main Document
Apr 20 2020Waiver of right of respondent James Slattery to respond filed.
Main Document
Apr 20 2020Waiver of right of respondents Millennium Lab Holdings II, LLC and Millennium Health, LLC to respond filed.
Main Document
May 05 2020DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 5/21/2020.
May 26 2020Petition DENIED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Sheila Sadighi
    Counsel of Record
Lowenstein Sandler LLP
One Lowenstein Drive
Roseland, NJ 07068

ssadighi@lowenstein.com
973-597-6218
Party name: ISL Loan Trust, et al.
Attorneys for Respondents
Richard P. Bress
    Counsel of Record
Latham & Watkins LLP
555 11th Street, NW
Suite 1000
Washington, DC 20004

rick.bress@lw.com
202-637-2137
Party name: Millennium Lab Holdings II, LLC and Millennium Health, LLC
William McGinley Jay
    Counsel of Record
Goodwin Procter LLP
1900 N Street, N.W.
Washington, DC 20036

WJay@goodwinlaw.com
2023464190
Party name: TA Millennium, Inc. and TA Associates Management, L.P.
John Caviness O'Quinn
    Counsel of Record
Kirkland & Ellis LLP
1300 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20004

john.oquinn@kirkland.com
202-389-5191
Party name: James Slattery

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543