Docket for 18-979
 | | No. 18-979
| Title: | Joshua Caleb Bohmker, et al., Petitioners v. Oregon, et al. | Docketed: | January 28, 2019 | | | Lower Ct: | United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit | Case Numbers: | (16-35262) | Decision Date: | September 12, 2018 | Rehearing Denied: | October 25, 2018 | Discretionary Court Decision Date: | | Analyst: | | Questions Presented |
|
Jan 18 2019 | Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due February 27, 2019) | | PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | Feb 14 2019 | Motion to extend the time to file a response from February 27, 2019 to March 29, 2019, submitted to The Clerk. | | Main Document | Feb 20 2019 | Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including March 29, 2019, for all respondents. | | | Feb 27 2019 | Brief amici curiae of Pacific Legal Foundation, et al. filed. | | Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | Mar 22 2019 | Brief of respondents Oregon, et al. in opposition filed. | | Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | Mar 28 2019 | Brief of respondents Rogue Riverkeeper, et al. in opposition filed. | | Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count | Apr 04 2019 | Reply of petitioners Joshua Caleb Bohmker, et al. filed. | | Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | Apr 10 2019 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 4/26/2019. | | | Apr 29 2019 | Petition DENIED. | | |
|