Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 18-974
RSS Feed Print Notify Me
Search documents in this case:
No. 18-974
Title:Mar-Bow Value Partners, LLC, Petitioner
v.
McKinsey Recovery & Transformation Services US LLC
Docketed:January 28, 2019
Linked with 18A535
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Fourth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(17-2268, 17-2269)
   Decision Date:September 6, 2018
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Nov 20 2018Application (18A535) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from December 5, 2018 to January 22, 2019, submitted to The Chief Justice.
Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsLower Court Orders/OpinionsProof of Service
Nov 26 2018Application (18A535) granted by The Chief Justice extending the time to file until January 22, 2019.
Jan 22 2019Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due February 27, 2019)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 11 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response from February 27, 2019 to March 29, 2019, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Feb 13 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including March 29, 2019.
Mar 19 2019Brief of respondents McKinsey Recovery & Transformation Services US LLC, et al. in opposition filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Apr 01 2019Reply of petitioner Mar-Bow Value Partners, LLC filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Apr 02 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 4/18/2019.
Apr 22 2019Petition DENIED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Laurence Henry Tribe
    Counsel of Record
Harvard Law School
Faculty Office Building
Cambridge, MA 02138

tribe@law.harvard.edu
6175127018
Party name: Mar-Bow Value Partners, LLC
Attorneys for Respondents
Roy T. Englert Jr.
    Counsel of Record
Robbins, Russell, et al.
2000 K Street, N.W
4th Floor
Washington, DC 20006

renglert@robbinsrussell.com
2027754503
Party name: McKinsey Recovery & Transformation Services US LLC, et al.

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543