SEARCH TIPS
Search term too short
Invalid text in search term. Try again
ADVANCED SEARCH
DOCKET SEARCH
Search
Toggle navigation
OPINIONS
Opinions of the Court
Opinions Relating to Orders
In-Chambers Opinions
U. S. Reports
Online Sources Cited in Opinions
Media Files Cited in Opinions
Case Citation Finder
FILING & RULES
Electronic Filing
Rules and Guidance
Supreme Court Bar
ORAL ARGUMENTS
Argument Transcripts
Argument Audio
Calendars and Lists
Courtroom Seating
CASE DOCUMENTS
Docket Search
Orders of the Court
Orders by Circuit
Granted/Noted Cases List
Journal
NEWS MEDIA
Services for News Media
Press Releases
Media Advisories
Press Credentials
Speeches
A Reporter's Guide to Applications
Chief Justice's Year-End Reports on the Federal Judiciary
ABOUT
Justices
Supreme Court at Work
Code of Conduct for Justices
History and Traditions
The Supreme Court Building
Building Regulations
Frequently Asked Questions
VISIT
Hours & Directions
Prohibited Items
Visitor Guidelines
Accessibility
Maps & Guides
Courtroom Lectures
Exhibitions
Group Visits
Activities for Students & Families
Café & Building Amenities
Home
>
Search Results
Docket for 18-816
Search documents in this case:
Search
No. 18-816
Title:
Gavin B. Davis, Petitioner
v.
United States
Docketed:
December 27, 2018
Lower Ct:
United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit
Case Numbers:
(18-55741)
Decision Date:
July 19, 2018
Rehearing Denied:
November 6, 2018
Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented
Date
Proceedings and Orders
Nov 14 2018
Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due January 28, 2019)
Petition
Appendix
Certificate of Word Count
Proof of Service
Jan 28 2019
Waiver of right of respondent United States to respond filed.
Main Document
Feb 06 2019
DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 2/22/2019.
Feb 25 2019
Petition DENIED.
NAME
ADDRESS
PHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Gavin B. Davis
615 C Street, #325
San Diego, CA 92101
gavinprivate96@gmail.com
(858) 876-4346
Party name: Gavin B. Davis
Attorneys for Respondent
Noel J. Francisco
Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001
SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
##LOC[Cancel]##
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
##LOC[Cancel]##