Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 18-7887
RSS Feed Print Notify Me
Search documents in this case:
No. 18-7887
Title:Rodney Lyle Roberts, Petitioner
v.
United States
Docketed:February 11, 2019
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Fifth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(18-50017)
   Decision Date:October 22, 2018
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Jan 14 2019Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due March 13, 2019)
Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma PauperisPetitionAppendixProof of Service
Feb 27 2019Waiver of right of respondent United States to respond filed.
Main Document
Mar 07 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 3/22/2019.
Mar 25 2019Petition DENIED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Rodney Lyle Roberts#80689-380
FCC Oakdale II FPC
P.O. Box 5010
Oakdale, LA 71463

Party name: Rodney Lyle Roberts
Attorneys for Respondent
Noel J. Francisco
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543