Docket for 18-6189
 | | No. 18-6189
| Title: | Eduardo Salgado, Petitioner v. California | Docketed: | October 3, 2018 | | | Lower Ct: | Court of Appeal of California, Second Appellate District | Case Numbers: | (B282368) | Decision Date: | February 28, 2018 | Rehearing Denied: | | Discretionary Court Decision Date: | May 23, 2018 | Analyst: | | Questions Presented |
|
Jul 30 2018 | Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due November 2, 2018) | | Petition | Oct 19 2018 | Waiver of right of respondent State Of California to respond filed. | | Main Document | Nov 08 2018 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 11/30/2018. | | | Dec 03 2018 | Petition DENIED. | | |
|