SEARCH TIPS
Search term too short
Invalid text in search term. Try again
ADVANCED SEARCH
DOCKET SEARCH
Search
Toggle navigation
OPINIONS
Opinions of the Court
Opinions Relating to Orders
In-Chambers Opinions
U. S. Reports
Online Sources Cited in Opinions
Media Files Cited in Opinions
Case Citation Finder
FILING & RULES
Electronic Filing
Rules and Guidance
Supreme Court Bar
ORAL ARGUMENTS
Argument Transcripts
Argument Audio
Calendars and Lists
Courtroom Seating
CASE DOCUMENTS
Docket Search
Orders of the Court
Orders by Circuit
Granted/Noted Cases List
Journal
NEWS MEDIA
Services for News Media
Press Releases
Media Advisories
Press Credentials
Speeches
A Reporter's Guide to Applications
Chief Justice's Year-End Reports on the Federal Judiciary
ABOUT
Justices
Supreme Court at Work
Code of Conduct for Justices
History and Traditions
The Supreme Court Building
Building Regulations
Frequently Asked Questions
VISIT
Hours & Directions
Prohibited Items
Visitor Guidelines
Accessibility
Maps & Guides
Courtroom Lectures
Exhibitions
Group Visits
Activities for Students & Families
Café & Building Amenities
Home
>
Search Results
Docket for 18-5960
Search documents in this case:
Search
No. 18-5960
Title:
Kenneth Gharib, Petitioner
v.
Thomas H. Casey
Docketed:
September 13, 2018
Linked with 18A134
Lower Ct:
United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit
Case Numbers:
(16-55007)
Decision Date:
July 28, 2017
Rule 12.4
Rehearing Denied:
May 8, 2018
Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented
Date
Proceedings and Orders
Jul 26 2018
Application (18A134) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from August 6, 2018 to September 5, 2018, submitted to The Chief Justice.
Main Document
Aug 06 2018
Application (18A134) granted by The Chief Justice extending the time to file until September 5, 2018.
Sep 05 2018
Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due October 15, 2018)
Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis
Petition
Appendix
Appendix
Proof of Service
Certificate of Word Count
Oct 04 2018
Waiver of right of respondent Thomas Casey to respond filed.
Main Document
Oct 25 2018
DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 11/9/2018.
Nov 06 2018
Response Requested. (Due December 6, 2018)
Nov 30 2018
Brief of respondent Thomas Casey in opposition filed.
Main Document
Certificate of Word Count
Proof of Service
Dec 17 2018
Reply of petitioner Kenneth Gharib filed.
Main Document
Proof of Service
Certificate of Word Count
Dec 20 2018
DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/4/2019.
Jan 07 2019
Petition DENIED.
NAME
ADDRESS
PHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Tracy Casadio
Counsel of Record
Office of Federal Public Defender
321 E. 2nd Street
Los Angeles, CA 90012
tracy_casadio@fd.org
213-894-2854
Party name: Kenneth Gharib
Attorneys for Respondent
Kathleen J. McCarthy
Counsel of Record
The Law Office of Thomas H. Casey, Inc.
22342 Avenida Empresa, Suite 200
Rancho Santa Margarita, CA 92688
kmccarthy@tomcaseylaw.com
949-766-8787
Party name: Thomas Casey
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
##LOC[Cancel]##
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
##LOC[Cancel]##