Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 18-1468
RSS Feed Print Notify Me
Search documents in this case:
No. 18-1468
Title:United Mine Workers of America Combined Benefit Fund, et al., Petitioners
v.
Andre M. Toffel, as Chapter 7 Trustee for Walter Energy Inc., et al.
Docketed:May 24, 2019
Linked with 18A946
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Eleventh Circuit
   Case Numbers:(16-13483)
   Decision Date:December 27, 2018
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Mar 14 2019Application (18A946) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from March 27, 2019 to May 26, 2019, submitted to Justice Thomas.
Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsProof of Service
Mar 21 2019Application (18A946) granted by Justice Thomas extending the time to file until May 26, 2019.
May 24 2019Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due June 24, 2019)
PetitionCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
May 28 2019Waiver of right of respondent Andre M. Toffel, as Chapter 7 Trustee to respond filed.
Main Document
May 29 2019Waiver of right of respondents Warrior Met Coal, Inc. and Steering Committee of First Lien Holders to respond filed.
Main Document
Jun 04 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/20/2019.
Jun 24 2019Petition DENIED. Justice Alito took no part in the consideration or decision of this petition.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Bryan Michael Killian
    Counsel of Record
Morgan, Lewis & Bockius, LLP
1111 Pennsylvania Ave, NW
Washington, DC 20004

Bryan.killian@morganlewis.com
2023736191
Party name: United Mine Workers of America Combined Benefit Fund, et al.
Attorneys for Respondents
Forrest Stephen Latta
    Counsel of Record
Burr & Forman LLP
11 North Water Street
Suite 22200
Mobile, AL 36602-0000

flatta@burr.com
251-344-5151
Party name: Warrior Met Coal, Inc. and Steering Committee of First Lien Holders
Scott Burnett Smith
    Counsel of Record
Bradley Arant Boult Cummings, LLP
200 Clinton Avenue West, Suite 900
Huntsville, AL 35801

ssmith@bradley.com
256-517-5100
Party name: Andre M. Toffel, as Chapter 7 Trustee

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543