SEARCH TIPS
Search term too short
Invalid text in search term. Try again
ADVANCED SEARCH
DOCKET SEARCH
Search
Toggle navigation
OPINIONS
Opinions of the Court
Opinions Relating to Orders
In-Chambers Opinions
U. S. Reports
Online Sources Cited in Opinions
Media Files Cited in Opinions
Case Citation Finder
FILING & RULES
Electronic Filing
Rules and Guidance
Supreme Court Bar
ORAL ARGUMENTS
Argument Transcripts
Argument Audio
Calendars and Lists
Courtroom Seating
CASE DOCUMENTS
Docket Search
Orders of the Court
Orders by Circuit
Granted/Noted Cases List
Journal
NEWS MEDIA
Services for News Media
Press Releases
Media Advisories
Press Credentials
Speeches
A Reporter's Guide to Applications
Chief Justice's Year-End Reports on the Federal Judiciary
ABOUT
Justices
Supreme Court at Work
Code of Conduct for Justices
History and Traditions
The Supreme Court Building
Building Regulations
Frequently Asked Questions
VISIT
Hours & Directions
Prohibited Items
Visitor Guidelines
Accessibility
Maps & Guides
Courtroom Lectures
Exhibitions
Group Visits
Activities for Students & Families
Café & Building Amenities
Home
>
Search Results
Docket for 18-1427
Search documents in this case:
Search
No. 18-1427
Title:
Marie Laventure, et al., Petitioners
v.
United Nations, et al.
Docketed:
May 14, 2019
Linked with 18A937
Lower Ct:
United States Court of Appeals for the Second Circuit
Case Numbers:
(17-2908)
Decision Date:
December 28, 2018
Rehearing Denied:
Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Date
Proceedings and Orders
Mar 14 2019
Application (18A937) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from March 28, 2019 to May 13, 2019, submitted to Justice Ginsburg.
Main Document
Lower Court Orders/Opinions
Proof of Service
Mar 18 2019
Application (18A937) granted by Justice Ginsburg extending the time to file until May 13, 2019.
May 10 2019
Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due June 13, 2019)
Petition
Appendix
Certificate of Word Count
Proof of Service
Jun 06 2019
Brief amicus curiae of Hear Their Cries--Stop Child Rape in Aid filed.
Main Document
Proof of Service
Certificate of Word Count
Jun 26 2019
DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/1/2019.
Oct 07 2019
Petition DENIED.
Oct 30 2019
Petition for Rehearing filed.
Main Document
Certificate of Word Count
Proof of Service
Nov 06 2019
DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 11/22/2019.
Nov 25 2019
Rehearing DENIED.
NAME
ADDRESS
PHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
James Francis Haggerty
Counsel of Record
Attorney at Law
45 Broadway, Suite 3140
New York, NY 10006
jhaggerty@haggertylegal.com
212-480-0700
Party name: Marie Laventure, et al.
Attorneys for Respondents
Noel J. Francisco
Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001
SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United Nations, et al.
Other
Edward Patrick Flaherty
Counsel of Record
Schwab, Flaherty, & Associes
7, rue de Candolle
Geneva, XX CH-1205
flaherty@int-lawyers.co
+41228405000
Party name: Hear Their Cries--Stop Child Rape in Aid
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
##LOC[Cancel]##
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
##LOC[Cancel]##