Docket for 18-1160
 | | No. 18-1160
| Title: | Teck Metals Ltd., fka Teck Cominco Metals, Ltd., Petitioner v. The Confederated Tribes of the Colville Reservation, et al. | Docketed: | March 6, 2019 | | | Lower Ct: | United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit | Case Numbers: | (16-35742) | Decision Date: | September 14, 2018 | Rehearing Denied: | December 4, 2018 | Discretionary Court Decision Date: | | | | |
|
Mar 04 2019 | Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due April 5, 2019) | | PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | Mar 22 2019 | Blanket Consent filed by Petitioner, Teck Metals Ltd., formerly known as Teck Cominco Metals, Ltd. | | Blanket Consent | Mar 29 2019 | Motion to extend the time to file a response from April 5, 2019 to May 6, 2019, submitted to The Clerk. | | Main Document | Apr 02 2019 | Motion to extend the time to file a response from April 5, 2019 to May 6, 2019, submitted to The Clerk. | | Main Document | Apr 04 2019 | The motions to extend the time to file responses are granted and the time is extended to and including May 6, 2019, for all respondents. | | | Apr 05 2019 | Brief amicus curiae of Her Majesty the Queen in Right of the Province of British Columbia filed. | | Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | Apr 05 2019 | Brief amicus curiae of The Government of Canada filed. | | Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | Apr 05 2019 | Brief amici curiae of Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America, et al. filed. | | Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | May 06 2019 | Brief of respondent State of Washington in opposition filed. | | Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | May 06 2019 | Brief of respondent The Confederated Tribes of the Colville Reservation in opposition filed. | | Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count | May 20 2019 | Reply of petitioner Teck Metals Ltd., formerly known as Teck Cominco Metals, Ltd. filed. | | Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | May 21 2019 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/6/2019. | | | Jun 10 2019 | Petition DENIED. | | |
|