SEARCH TIPS
Search term too short
Invalid text in search term. Try again
ADVANCED SEARCH
DOCKET SEARCH
Search
Toggle navigation
OPINIONS
Opinions of the Court
Opinions Relating to Orders
In-Chambers Opinions
U. S. Reports
Online Sources Cited in Opinions
Media Files Cited in Opinions
Case Citation Finder
FILING & RULES
Electronic Filing
Rules and Guidance
Supreme Court Bar
ORAL ARGUMENTS
Argument Transcripts
Argument Audio
Calendars and Lists
Courtroom Seating
CASE DOCUMENTS
Docket Search
Orders of the Court
Orders by Circuit
Granted/Noted Cases List
Journal
NEWS MEDIA
Services for News Media
Press Releases
Media Advisories
Press Credentials
Speeches
A Reporter's Guide to Applications
Chief Justice's Year-End Reports on the Federal Judiciary
ABOUT
Justices
Supreme Court at Work
Code of Conduct for Justices
History and Traditions
The Supreme Court Building
Building Regulations
Frequently Asked Questions
VISIT
Hours & Directions
Prohibited Items
Visitor Guidelines
Accessibility
Maps & Guides
Courtroom Lectures
Exhibitions
Group Visits
Activities for Students & Families
Café & Building Amenities
Home
>
Search Results
Docket for 17-8336
Search documents in this case:
Search
No. 17-8336
Title:
Matthew Vaughn Diamond, Petitioner
v.
Minnesota
Docketed:
April 3, 2018
Lower Ct:
Supreme Court of Minnesota
Case Numbers:
(A15-2075)
Decision Date:
January 17, 2018
Rehearing Denied:
Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented
Date
Proceedings and Orders
Mar 29 2018
Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due May 3, 2018)
Petition
Appendix
Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis
Proof of Service
Apr 23 2018
Waiver of right of respondent State of Minnesota to respond filed.
Main Document
Apr 25 2018
DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 5/10/2018.
May 14 2018
Petition DENIED.
NAME
ADDRESS
PHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Steven P. Russett
Counsel of Record
Office of the Appellate Public Defender
540 Fairview Ave N
Suite 300
Saint Paul, MN 55104
steven.russett@pubdef.state.mn.us
6512016700
Party name: Matthew Diamond
Attorneys for Respondent
Mark Metz
Counsel of Record
Carver County Attorney's Office
604 East 4th Street
Chaska, MN 55318
mmetz@co.carver.mn.us
952-361-1400
Party name: State of Minnesota
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
##LOC[Cancel]##
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
##LOC[Cancel]##