Docket for 17-7973
 | | No. 17-7973
| Title: | Roosevelt W., et ux., Petitioners v. Los Angeles County Department of Children and Family Services | Docketed: | March 5, 2018 | | | Lower Ct: | Court of Appeal of California, Second Appellate District | Case Numbers: | (B277764) | Decision Date: | July 28, 2017 | Rehearing Denied: | August 21, 2017 | Discretionary Court Decision Date: | October 18, 2017 | Analyst: | | Questions Presented |
|
Oct 28 2017 | Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due April 4, 2018) | | | Apr 04 2018 | Waiver of right of respondent Los Angeles County Department of Children and Family Services to respond filed. | | Main Document | Apr 12 2018 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 4/27/2018. | | | Apr 30 2018 | Petition DENIED. | | | May 25 2018 | Petition for Rehearing filed. | | Main Document | Jul 12 2018 | DISTRIBUTED. | | | Aug 06 2018 | Rehearing DENIED. | | |
|