Docket for 17-780
 | | No. 17-780
| Title: | John T. Morris, Appellant v. Texas, et al. | Docketed: | November 28, 2017 | | | Lower Ct: | United States District Court for the Western District of Texas | Case Numbers: | (SA-11-CV-360) | Decision Date: | August 15, 2017 | Rehearing Denied: | | Discretionary Court Decision Date: | | Analyst: | | Questions Presented |
|
Nov 22 2017 | Statement as to jurisdiction filed. (Response due December 28, 2017) | | | Dec 19 2017 | Waiver of right of appellee Texas, et al. to respond filed. | | Main Document | Dec 20 2017 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/5/2018. | | | Jan 08 2018 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/12/2018. | | | Jan 16 2018 | Appeal dismissed for want of jurisdiction. | | | Mar 28 2018 | JUDGMENT ISSUED. | | |
|