Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 17-455
RSS Feed Print Notify Me
Search documents in this case:
No. 17-455
Title:First Southern National Bank, Petitioner
v.
Sunnyslope Housing Limited Partnership
Docketed:September 26, 2017
Linked with 17A180
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(12-17241, 12-17327, 13-16164, 13-16180)
   Decision Date:May 26, 2017
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Aug 11 2017Application (17A180) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from August 24, 2017 to September 22, 2017, submitted to Justice Kennedy.
Aug 16 2017Application (17A180) granted by Justice Kennedy extending the time to file until September 22, 2017.
Sep 22 2017Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due October 26, 2017)
Oct 02 2017Order extending time to file response to petition to and including November 27, 2017.
Oct 23 2017Blanket Consent filed by Petitioner, First Southern National Bank
Oct 24 2017Blanket Consent filed by Respondent, Sunnyslope Housing, Limited Partership
Oct 26 2017Brief amici curiae of Law Professors and Retired United States Bankruptcy Judges in support of writ of certiorari filed.
Oct 26 2017Brief amicus curiae of Arizona Bankers Association filed.
Nov 27 2017Brief of respondent Sunnyslope Housing, Limited Partership in opposition filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 12 2017Reply of petitioner First Southern National Bank filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 13 2017DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/5/2018.
Jan 08 2018Petition DENIED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Craig Goldblatt
    Counsel of Record
Wilmer Cutler Pickering Hale and Dorr LLP
1875 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20006

202-663-6000
Party name: First Southern National Bank
Attorneys for Respondent
Susan M. Freeman
    Counsel of Record
Lewis Roca Rothgerber Christie, LLP
201 East Washington Street
Suite 1200
Phoenix, AZ 85004

sfreeman@lrrc.com
(602) 262-5756
Party name: Sunnyslope Housing, Limited Partership
Other
Donald L. Gaffney
    Counsel of Record
Snell & Wilmer, L.L.P.
One Arizona Center, 400 E. Van Buren Street
Phoenix, AZ 85004-2202

dgaffney@swlaw.com
602 382 6000
Party name: Arizona Bankers Association
Beverly Weiss Manne
    Counsel of Record
Tucker Arensberg, P.C.
1500 One PPG Place
Pittsburgh, PA 15222

bmanne@tuckerlaw.com
412 556 1212
Party name: Law Professors and Retired United States Bankruptcy Judges

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543