Docket for 17-431
|
Jul 28 2017 | Application (17A133) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from August 7, 2017 to October 6, 2017, submitted to Justice Kennedy. | | | Jul 31 2017 | Application (17A133) granted by Justice Kennedy extending the time to file until September 21, 2017. | | | Sep 21 2017 | Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due October 23, 2017) | | | Oct 18 2017 | Order extending time to file response to petition to and including November 22, 2017. | | | Oct 23 2017 | Brief amicus curiae of American Textile Recycling Service, Inc. filed. | | | Nov 06 2017 | Brief of respondent City of Oakland in opposition filed. | | | Nov 20 2017 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 12/8/2017. | | | Nov 20 2017 | Reply of petitioner Recycle for Change filed. (Distributed) | | Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | Dec 11 2017 | Petition DENIED. | | |
|