Docket for 17-42
 | | No. 17-42 Vide 17-40 | Title: | Desert Water Agency, et al., Petitioners v. Agua Caliente Band of Cahuilla Indians, et al. | Docketed: | July 7, 2017 | Linked with 16A958 | | Lower Ct: | United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit | Case Numbers: | (15-55896) | Decision Date: | March 7, 2017 | Rehearing Denied: | | Discretionary Court Decision Date: | | Analyst: | | Questions Presented |
|
Apr 07 2017 | Application (16A958) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from June 5, 2017 to July 5, 2017, submitted to Justice Kennedy. | | | Apr 10 2017 | Application (16A958) granted by Justice Kennedy extending the time to file until July 5, 2017. | | | Jul 03 2017 | Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due August 7, 2017) | | | Jul 10 2017 | Consent to the filing of amicus curiae briefs, in support of either party or of neither party, received from counsel for petitioners. | | | Jul 24 2017 | Order extending time to file response to petition to and including September 6, 2017, for all respondents. | | | Aug 07 2017 | Brief amicus curiae of Pacific Legal Foundation filed. VIDED. | | | Aug 07 2017 | Brief amici curiae of Association of California Water Agencies, et al. filed. VIDED. | | | Aug 07 2017 | Brief amici curiae of The States of Nevada, et al. filed. VIDED. | | | Aug 31 2017 | Order further extending time to file response to petition to and including October 6, 2017, for all respondents. | | | Oct 06 2017 | Order further extending time to file response to petition to and including October 13, 2017, for all respondents. | | | Oct 13 2017 | Brief of Federal Respondents in opposition filed. VIDED. | | | Oct 13 2017 | Brief of respondent Agua Caliente Band of Cahuilla Indians in opposition filed. VIDED. | | | Oct 27 2017 | Reply of petitioners Desert Water Agency, et al. filed. | | | Nov 01 2017 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 11/21/2017. | | | Nov 02 2017 | Supplemental brief of respondent Agua Caliente Band of Cahuilla Indians filed. VIDED. (Distributed) | | | Nov 03 2017 | Supplemental brief of petitioners Desert Water Agency, et al. filed. (Distributed) | | | Nov 27 2017 | Petition DENIED. | | |
|