Docket for 17-171
 | | No. 17-171
| Title: | Papierfabrik August Koehler SE, Petitioner v. United States, et al. | Docketed: | August 2, 2017 | Linked with 16A1067 | | Lower Ct: | United States Court of Appeals for the Federal Circuit | Case Numbers: | (15-1489) | Decision Date: | December 16, 2016 | Rehearing Denied: | March 3, 2017 | Discretionary Court Decision Date: | | Analyst: | | Questions Presented |
|
May 03 2017 | Application (16A1067) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from June 1, 2017 to July 31, 2017, submitted to The Chief Justice. | | | May 09 2017 | Application (16A1067) granted by The Chief Justice extending the time to file until July 31, 2017. | | | Jul 31 2017 | Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due September 1, 2017) | | | Aug 23 2017 | Order extending time to file response to petition to and including October 2, 2017. | | | Sep 22 2017 | Order further extending time to file response to petition to and including November 1, 2017. | | | Sep 26 2017 | Waiver of right of respondent Appvion, Inc. to respond filed. | | | Nov 01 2017 | Brief of respondent United States in opposition filed. | | | Nov 17 2017 | Reply of petitioner Papierfabrick August Koehler SE filed. | | Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | Nov 20 2017 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 12/8/2017. | | | Dec 11 2017 | Petition DENIED. | | |
|