Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 17-1698
RSS Feed Print Notify Me
Search documents in this case:
No. 17-1698
Title:Pacetta, LLC, et al., Petitioners
v.
Town of Ponce Inlet, Florida
Docketed:June 25, 2018
Linked with 17A996
Lower Ct:District Court of Appeal of Florida, Fifth District
   Case Numbers:(5D14-4520)
   Decision Date:June 16, 2017
   Rehearing Denied:September 25, 2017
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:January 23, 2018
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Mar 14 2018Application (17A996) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from April 23, 2018 to June 21, 2018, submitted to Justice Thomas.
Main Document
Mar 20 2018Application (17A996) granted by Justice Thomas extending the time to file until June 21, 2018.
Jun 21 2018Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due July 25, 2018)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 24 2018Response to petition from respondent Town of Ponce Inlet filed.
Main DocumentOtherProof of Service
Jul 25 2018Motion for leave to file amici brief filed by Cato Institute, et al.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Aug 03 2018Reply of petitioners Pacetta, LLC, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 03 2018Reply of Pacetta, LLC, et al. not accepted for filing. (August 07, 2018)(Electronic Version to be Resubmitted)
Aug 08 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 9/24/2018.
Oct 01 2018Motion for leave to file amici brief filed by Cato Institute, et. al. GRANTED.
Oct 01 2018Petition DENIED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Christina Marie Martin
    Counsel of Record
Pacific Legal Foundation
8645 N. Military Trail, Suite 511
Palm Beach Gardens, FL 33410

cmartin@pacificlegal.org
561-691-5000
Party name: Pacetta, LLC, et al.
Attorneys for Respondent
Elliot H. Scherker
    Counsel of Record
Greenberg Traurig, P.A.
333 Southeast Second Avenue
Suite 4400
Miami, FL 33131

scherkere@gtlaw.com
305-579-0500
Party name: Town of Ponce Inlet
Other
Ilya Shapiro
    Counsel of Record
Cato Institute
1000 Massachusetts Ave., NW
Washington, DC 20001

ishapiro@cato.org
2028420200
Party name: Cato Institute, et. al.

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543