SEARCH TIPS
Search term too short
Invalid text in search term. Try again
ADVANCED SEARCH
DOCKET SEARCH
Search
Toggle navigation
OPINIONS
Opinions of the Court
Opinions Relating to Orders
In-Chambers Opinions
U. S. Reports
Online Sources Cited in Opinions
Media Files Cited in Opinions
Case Citation Finder
FILING & RULES
Electronic Filing
Rules and Guidance
Supreme Court Bar
ORAL ARGUMENTS
Argument Transcripts
Argument Audio
Calendars and Lists
Courtroom Seating
CASE DOCUMENTS
Docket Search
Orders of the Court
Orders by Circuit
Granted/Noted Cases List
Journal
NEWS MEDIA
Services for News Media
Press Releases
Media Advisories
Press Credentials
Speeches
A Reporter's Guide to Applications
Chief Justice's Year-End Reports on the Federal Judiciary
ABOUT
Justices
Supreme Court at Work
Code of Conduct for Justices
History and Traditions
The Supreme Court Building
Building Regulations
Frequently Asked Questions
VISIT
Hours & Directions
Prohibited Items
Visitor Guidelines
Accessibility
Maps & Guides
Courtroom Lectures
Exhibitions
Group Visits
Activities for Students & Families
Café & Building Amenities
Home
>
Search Results
Docket for 17-1652
Search documents in this case:
Search
No. 17-1652
Title:
Credit One Bank, N.A., Petitioner
v.
Orrin S. Anderson
Docketed:
June 8, 2018
Lower Ct:
United States Court of Appeals for the Second Circuit
Case Numbers:
(16-2496)
Decision Date:
March 7, 2018
Rehearing Denied:
Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented
Date
Proceedings and Orders
Jun 05 2018
Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due July 9, 2018)
Petition
Appendix
Certificate of Word Count
Proof of Service
Jun 08 2018
Waiver of right of respondent Orrin S. Anderson to respond filed.
Main Document
Jun 13 2018
DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 9/24/2018.
Jul 02 2018
Response Requested. (Due August 1, 2018)
Aug 01 2018
Brief of respondent Orrin S. Anderson in opposition filed.
Main Document
Certificate of Word Count
Proof of Service
Aug 15 2018
DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 9/24/2018.
Aug 15 2018
Reply of petitioner Credit One Bank, N.A. filed. (Distributed)
Main Document
Certificate of Word Count
Proof of Service
Oct 01 2018
Petition DENIED.
NAME
ADDRESS
PHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Seth P. Waxman
Counsel of Record
Wilmer Cutler Pickering Hale and Dorr LLP
1875 Pennsylvania Ave, NW
Washington, DC 20006
Seth.Waxman@wilmerhale.com
202-663-6800
Party name: Credit One Bank, N.A.
Attorneys for Respondent
George Fortune Carpinello
Counsel of Record
Boies Schiller Flexner LLP
30 South Pearl Street
Albany, NY 12207
gcarpinello@bsfllp.com
5184340600
Party name: Orrin S. Anderson
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
##LOC[Cancel]##
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
##LOC[Cancel]##