Docket for 17-1543
 | | No. 17-1543
| Title: | Brenda Olivar, et al., Petitioners v. Public Service Employee Credit Union Long Term Disability Plan, et al. | Docketed: | May 15, 2018 | | | Lower Ct: | Supreme Court of Colorado | Case Numbers: | (15SC801, 16SC163) | Decision Date: | February 12, 2018 | Rehearing Denied: | | Discretionary Court Decision Date: | | Analyst: | | Questions Presented |
|
May 11 2018 | Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due June 14, 2018) | | PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | Jun 06 2018 | Waiver of right of respondents Public Service Employee Credit Union Long Term Disability Plan, et al. to respond filed. | | Main Document | Jun 13 2018 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 9/24/2018. | | | Jun 25 2018 | Response Requested. (Due July 25, 2018) | | | Jul 25 2018 | Brief of respondents Public Service Employee Credit Union Long Term Disability Plan, et al. in opposition filed. | | Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | Aug 08 2018 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 9/24/2018. | | | Oct 01 2018 | Petition DENIED. | | |
|