Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 17-1399
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 17-1399
Title:United States, ex rel. Joseph Ibanez, et al., Petitioners
v.
Bristol-Myers Squibb Company, et al.
Docketed:April 6, 2018
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Sixth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(16-3154)
   Decision Date:October 27, 2017
   Rehearing Denied:January 3, 2018
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Apr 03 2018Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due May 7, 2018)
PetitionCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
May 03 2018Waiver of right of respondent Bristol - Myers Squibb Co. to respond filed.
Main Document
May 04 2018Waiver of right of respondent Otsuka America Pharmaceutical, Inc. to respond filed.
Main Document
May 08 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 5/24/2018.
May 29 2018Petition DENIED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
David J. Chizewer
    Counsel of Record
Goldberg Kohn Bell Black Rosenbloom & Moritz Ltd.
55 East Monroe Street
Suite 3300
Chicago, IL 60603

david.chizewer@goldbergkohn.com
312-201-4000
Party name: United States of America Ex Rel., et al.
Attorneys for Respondents
Jessica Lynn Ellsworth
    Counsel of Record
Hogan Lovells US, LLP
555 13th Street, N. W.
Washington, DC 20004

jessica.ellsworth@hoganlovells.com
202-637-5886
Party name: Bristol-Myers Squibb Company
Jennifer L. Spaziano
    Counsel of Record
Skadden Arps, Slate, Meagher & Flom LLP
1440 New York Avenue NW
Washington, DC 20005

jen.spaziano@skadden.com
202-371-7872
Party name: Otsuka America Pharmaceutical, Inc.

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543