Docket for 17-1375
|
Feb 07 2018 | Application (17A839) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from February 25, 2018 to March 28, 2018, submitted to Justice Kennedy. | | Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsProof of Service | Feb 08 2018 | Application (17A839) granted by Justice Kennedy extending the time to file until March 28, 2018. | | | Mar 28 2018 | Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due April 30, 2018) | | PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | Apr 03 2018 | Waiver of right of respondent Agricultural Labor Relations Board to respond filed. | | Main Document | Apr 03 2018 | Waiver of right of respondent Real Party in Interest, United Farm Workers of America to respond filed. | | | Apr 11 2018 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 4/27/2018. | | | Apr 16 2018 | Response Requested. (Due May 16, 2018) | | | Apr 27 2018 | Motion for leave to file amici brief filed by The NFIB Small Business Legal Center and Southeastern Legal Foundation. | | Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of ServiceOther | May 01 2018 | Brief amici curiae of Pacific Legal Foundation, et al. filed. | | Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | May 04 2018 | Motion to extend the time to file a response from May 16, 2018 to June 15, 2018, submitted to The Clerk. | | Main Document | May 07 2018 | Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including June 15, 2018. | | | May 14 2018 | Brief amicus curiae of Silvia Lopez filed. | | Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | May 16 2018 | Brief amici curiae of Roberto Angeles, et al. filed. | | Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | Jun 05 2018 | Supplemental brief of petitioner Gerawan Farming, Inc. filed. | | Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | Jun 15 2018 | Brief of respondent Agricultural Labor Relations Board in opposition filed. | | Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | Jun 15 2018 | Brief of respondent United Farm Workers of America in opposition filed. | | Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | Jul 03 2018 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 9/24/2018. | | | Jul 03 2018 | Reply of petitioner Gerawan Farming, Inc. filed. (Distributed) | | Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | Oct 01 2018 | Motion for leave to file amici brief filed by The NFIB Small Business Legal Center and Southeastern Legal Foundation GRANTED. | | | Oct 01 2018 | Petition DENIED. | | |
|