Docket for 17-1198
|
Jan 11 2018 | Application (17A735) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from January 23, 2019 to February 22, 2019, submitted to Justice Kennedy. | | Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsProof of Service | Jan 12 2018 | Application (17A735) granted by Justice Kennedy extending the time to file until February 22, 2018. | | | Feb 22 2018 | Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due March 28, 2018) | | PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | Mar 06 2018 | Blanket Consent filed by Petitioners, Martins Beach 1, LLC and Martins Beach 2, LLC. | | Blanket Consent | Mar 28 2018 | Brief amicus curiae of California Business Properties Association filed. | | Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | Mar 28 2018 | Brief amici curiae of Pacific Legal Foundation and Western Manufactured Housing Communities Association filed. | | Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | Mar 28 2018 | Brief amici curiae of California Association of Realtors, et al. filed. | | Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | Mar 28 2018 | Brief amicus curiae of Institute for Justice filed. | | Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | Apr 11 2018 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 4/27/2018. | | | Apr 12 2018 | Response Requested. (Due May 14, 2018) | | | Apr 18 2018 | Motion to extend the time to file a response from May 14, 2018 to June 13, 2018, submitted to The Clerk. | | Main Document | Apr 19 2018 | Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including June 13, 2018. | | | Jun 13 2018 | Brief of respondent Surfrider Foundation in opposition filed. | | Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | Jun 27 2018 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 9/24/2018. | | | Jun 27 2018 | Reply of petitioners Martins Beach 1, LLC and Martins Beach 2, LLC filed. (Distributed) | | Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | Oct 01 2018 | Petition DENIED. | | |
|