SEARCH TIPS
Search term too short
Invalid text in search term. Try again
ADVANCED SEARCH
DOCKET SEARCH
Search
Toggle navigation
OPINIONS
Opinions of the Court
Opinions Relating to Orders
In-Chambers Opinions
U. S. Reports
Online Sources Cited in Opinions
Media Files Cited in Opinions
Case Citation Finder
FILING & RULES
Electronic Filing
Rules and Guidance
Supreme Court Bar
ORAL ARGUMENTS
Argument Transcripts
Argument Audio
Calendars and Lists
Courtroom Seating
CASE DOCUMENTS
Docket Search
Orders of the Court
Orders by Circuit
Granted/Noted Cases List
Journal
NEWS MEDIA
Services for News Media
Press Releases
Media Advisories
Press Credentials
Speeches
A Reporter's Guide to Applications
Chief Justice's Year-End Reports on the Federal Judiciary
ABOUT
Justices
Supreme Court at Work
Code of Conduct for Justices
History and Traditions
The Supreme Court Building
Building Regulations
Frequently Asked Questions
VISIT
Hours & Directions
Prohibited Items
Visitor Guidelines
Accessibility
Maps & Guides
Courtroom Lectures
Exhibitions
Group Visits
Activities for Students & Families
Café & Building Amenities
Home
>
Search Results
Docket for 17-1176
Search documents in this case:
Search
No. 17-1176
Title:
Heath Rankin, Petitioner
v.
Christian Longoria, et al.
Docketed:
February 22, 2018
Lower Ct:
United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit
Case Numbers:
(16-15606)
Decision Date:
October 10, 2017
Rehearing Denied:
November 21, 2017
Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented
Date
Proceedings and Orders
Feb 20 2018
Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due March 26, 2018)
Petition
Appendix
Certificate of Word Count
Proof of Service
Mar 13 2018
Motion to extend the time to file a response from March 26, 2018 to April 25, 2018, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Mar 22 2018
Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including April 25, 2018.
Apr 25 2018
Brief of respondents Christian Longoria, et al in opposition filed.
Main Document
Certificate of Word Count
Proof of Service
May 10 2018
Reply of petitioner Heath Rankin filed.
Main Document
Certificate of Word Count
Proof of Service
May 15 2018
DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 5/31/2018.
Jun 04 2018
Petition DENIED.
NAME
ADDRESS
PHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Nicholas D. Acedo
Counsel of Record
Struck Love Bojanowski & Acedo, PLC
3100 West Ray Road
Suite 300
Chandler, AZ 85226
nacedo@strucklove.com
480-420-1600
Party name: Heath Rankin
Attorneys for Respondents
Joel B. Robbins
Counsel of Record
Robbins & Curtin, P.L.L.C.
301 East Bethany Home Road
Suite B-100
Phoenix, AZ 85012
joel@robbinsandcurtin.com
(602)-285-0100
Party name: Christian Longoria, et al
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
##LOC[Cancel]##
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
##LOC[Cancel]##