SEARCH TIPS
Search term too short
Invalid text in search term. Try again
ADVANCED SEARCH
DOCKET SEARCH
Search
Toggle navigation
OPINIONS
Opinions of the Court
Opinions Relating to Orders
In-Chambers Opinions
U. S. Reports
Online Sources Cited in Opinions
Media Files Cited in Opinions
Case Citation Finder
FILING & RULES
Electronic Filing
Rules and Guidance
Supreme Court Bar
ORAL ARGUMENTS
Argument Transcripts
Argument Audio
Calendars and Lists
Courtroom Seating
CASE DOCUMENTS
Docket Search
Orders of the Court
Orders by Circuit
Granted/Noted Cases List
Journal
NEWS MEDIA
Services for News Media
Press Releases
Media Advisories
Press Credentials
Speeches
A Reporter's Guide to Applications
Chief Justice's Year-End Reports on the Federal Judiciary
ABOUT
Justices
Supreme Court at Work
Code of Conduct for Justices
History and Traditions
The Supreme Court Building
Building Regulations
Frequently Asked Questions
VISIT
Hours & Directions
Prohibited Items
Visitor Guidelines
Accessibility
Maps & Guides
Courtroom Lectures
Exhibitions
Group Visits
Activities for Students & Families
Café & Building Amenities
Home
>
Search Results
Docket for 17-1168
Search documents in this case:
Search
No. 17-1168
Title:
Mark Long, et al., Petitioners
v.
South Dakota
Docketed:
February 21, 2018
Lower Ct:
Supreme Court of South Dakota
Case Numbers:
(27381)
Decision Date:
November 21, 2017
Rehearing Denied:
Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented
Date
Proceedings and Orders
Feb 19 2018
Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due March 23, 2018)
Petition
Appendix
Certificate of Word Count
Proof of Service
Mar 23 2018
Brief of respondent State of South Dakota in opposition filed.
Main Document
Certificate of Word Count
Proof of Service
Apr 11 2018
DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 4/27/2018.
Apr 30 2018
Petition DENIED.
NAME
ADDRESS
PHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Mark Vernon Meierhenry
Counsel of Record
Meierhenry Sargent
315 South Phillips Avenue
Sioux Falls, SD 57104
mark@meierhenrylaw.com
605-336-3075
Party name: Mark Long, et al.
Attorneys for Respondent
Gary P. Thimsen
Counsel of Record
Woods, Fuller, et al.
300 South Phillips Avenue
Suite 300, P. O. Box 5027
Sioux Falls, SD 57117-5027
gary.thimsen@woodsfuller.com
(605) 336-3890
Party name: State of South Dakota
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
##LOC[Cancel]##
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
##LOC[Cancel]##