SEARCH TIPS
Search term too short
Invalid text in search term. Try again
ADVANCED SEARCH
DOCKET SEARCH
Search
Toggle navigation
OPINIONS
Opinions of the Court
Opinions Relating to Orders
In-Chambers Opinions
U. S. Reports
Online Sources Cited in Opinions
Media Files Cited in Opinions
Case Citation Finder
FILING & RULES
Electronic Filing
Rules and Guidance
Supreme Court Bar
ORAL ARGUMENTS
Argument Transcripts
Argument Audio
Calendars and Lists
Courtroom Seating
CASE DOCUMENTS
Docket Search
Orders of the Court
Orders by Circuit
Granted/Noted Cases List
Journal
NEWS MEDIA
Services for News Media
Press Releases
Media Advisories
Press Credentials
Speeches
A Reporter's Guide to Applications
Chief Justice's Year-End Reports on the Federal Judiciary
ABOUT
Justices
Supreme Court at Work
Code of Conduct for Justices
History and Traditions
The Supreme Court Building
Building Regulations
Frequently Asked Questions
VISIT
Hours & Directions
Prohibited Items
Accessibility
What Can I See and Do?
Exhibitions
Activities for Students & Families
Maps & Brochures
Student Group Visits
Etiquette
Café & Building Amenities
Home
>
Search Results
Docket for 17-1018
Search documents in this case:
Search
No. 17-1018
Title:
Uniloc USA, Inc., et al., Petitioners
v.
SEGA of America, Inc., et al.
Docketed:
January 23, 2018
Lower Ct:
United States Court of Appeals for the Federal Circuit
Case Numbers:
(16-2000)
Decision Date:
October 23, 2017
Rehearing Denied:
Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented
Date
Proceedings and Orders
Jan 19 2018
Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due February 22, 2018)
Petition
Appendix
Certificate of Word Count
Proof of Service
Feb 19 2018
Motion to extend the time to file a response from February 22, 2018 to March 26, 2018, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Feb 22 2018
Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including March 26, 2018.
Mar 26 2018
Brief of respondents SEGA of America, Inc., et al. in opposition filed.
Main Document
Certificate of Word Count
Proof of Service
Apr 11 2018
DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 4/27/2018.
Apr 30 2018
Petition DENIED.
NAME
ADDRESS
PHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Daniel L. Geyser
Counsel of Record
Stris & Maher LLP
Three Energy Square
6688 N. Central Expy., Suite 1650
Dallas, TX 75206
daniel.geyser@strismaher.com
214-396-6634
Party name: Uniloc USA, Inc., et al.
Attorneys for Respondents
Abran J. Kean
Counsel of Record
Erise IP, P.A.
5600 Greenwood Plaza Blvd
Suite 200
Greenwood Village, CO 80111
abran.kean@eriseip.com
913-777-5600
Party name: SEGA of America, Inc., et al.
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
##LOC[Cancel]##
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
##LOC[Cancel]##