Docket for 16-1320
 | | No. 16-1320 Vide 17-8 | Title: | Upstate Citizens for Equality, Inc., et al., Petitioners v. United States, et al. | Docketed: | May 2, 2017 | | | Lower Ct: | United States Court of Appeals for the Second Circuit | Case Numbers: | (15-1688, 15-1726) | Decision Date: | November 9, 2016 | Rehearing Denied: | January 27, 2017 | Discretionary Court Decision Date: | | Analyst: | | Questions Presented |
|
Apr 26 2017 | Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due June 1, 2017) | | | May 30 2017 | Order extending time to file response to petition to and including July 3, 2017. | | | Jun 30 2017 | Brief of respondents United States, et al. in opposition filed. | | | Jul 19 2017 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of September 25, 2017. | | | Sep 21 2017 | Rescheduled. | | | Oct 02 2017 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/6/2017. | | | Oct 03 2017 | Rescheduled. | | | Oct 10 2017 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/13/2017. | | | Oct 11 2017 | Rescheduled. | | | Oct 23 2017 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/27/2017. | | | Oct 24 2017 | Rescheduled. | | | Oct 30 2017 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 11/3/2017. | | | Nov 06 2017 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 11/9/2017. | | | Nov 13 2017 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 11/21/2017. | | | Nov 27 2017 | Petition DENIED Justice Thomas, dissenting from the denials of certiorari. (Detached Opinion) | | |
|