Docket for 16-1206
 | | No. 16-1206
| Title: | Finn Batato, et al., Petitioners v. United States | Docketed: | April 7, 2017 | Linked with 16A747 | | Lower Ct: | United States Court of Appeals for the Fourth Circuit | Case Numbers: | (15-1360) | Decision Date: | August 12, 2016 | Rehearing Denied: | November 9, 2016 | Discretionary Court Decision Date: | | Analyst: | | Questions Presented |
|
Jan 25 2017 | Application (16A747) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from February 7, 2017 to April 7, 2017, submitted to The Chief Justice. | | | Jan 26 2017 | Application (16A747) granted by The Chief Justice extending the time to file until April 7, 2017. | | | Apr 07 2017 | Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due May 8, 2017) | | | Apr 14 2017 | Consent to the filing of amicus curiae briefs, in support of either party or of neither party, received from counsel for petitioners. | | | May 03 2017 | Order extending time to file response to petition to and including June 7, 2017. | | | May 08 2017 | Brief amici curiae of Institute for Justice, et al. filed. | | | Jun 07 2017 | Brief of respondent United States in opposition filed. | | | Jun 21 2017 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of September 25, 2017. | | | Jun 21 2017 | Reply of petitioners Finn Batato, et al. filed. (Distributed) | | | Sep 01 2017 | Supplemental brief of petitioners Finn Batato, et al. filed. (Distributed) | | | Oct 02 2017 | Petition DENIED. | | |
|