Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 09-8854 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
RSS Feed Print Notify Me
Search documents in this case:
No. 09-8854 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
Title:Demarcus Ali Sears, Petitioner
v.
Stephen Upton, Warden
Docketed:January 29, 2010
Linked with 09A590
Lower Ct:Supreme Court of Georgia
   Case Numbers:(S08E1253)
   Decision Date:September 28, 2009
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Dec 15 2009Application (09A590) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from December 27, 2009 to January 27, 2010, submitted to Justice Thomas.
Dec 24 2009Application (09A590) granted by Justice Thomas extending the time to file until January 27, 2010.
Jan 26 2010Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due March 1, 2010)
Feb 18 2010Brief of respondent Stephen Upton, Warden in opposition filed.
Feb 26 2010Reply of petitioner Demarcus Ali Sears filed.
Mar 04 2010DISTRIBUTED for Conference of March 19, 2010.
Mar 17 2010Record Requested.
Mar 29 2010Record received from the Supreme Court of Georgia and the Superior Court of Butts County State of Georgia (1 box).
Apr 01 2010DISTRIBUTED for Conference of April 16, 2010.
Apr 08 2010Record received from Butts County Superior Court State of Georgia (Transcripts of trial, 2 boxes).
Apr 15 2010DISTRIBUTED for Conference of April 30, 2010.
May 10 2010DISTRIBUTED for Conference of May 13, 2010.
May 17 2010DISTRIBUTED for Conference of May 20, 2010.
May 24 2010DISTRIBUTED for Conference of May 27, 2010.
Jun 01 2010DISTRIBUTED for Conference of June 3, 2010.
Jun 07 2010DISTRIBUTED for Conference of June 10, 2010.
Jun 14 2010DISTRIBUTED for Conference of June 17, 2010.
Jun 21 2010DISTRIBUTED for Conference of June 24, 2010.
Aug 02 2010MANDATE ISSUED.
Aug 03 2010Record returned to Supreme Court of Georgia.
Aug 03 2010Record returned to Butts County Superior Court.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Robert Edwards600 Peachtree Street, NE
Suite 5200
Atlanta, GA 30308

Bob.edwards@troutmansanders.com
(404) 885-3134
Party name: Demarcus Ali Sears
Attorneys for Respondent
Beth A. Burton
    Counsel of Record
Deputy Attorney General
GA Law Department
40 Capitol Square, SW
Atlanta, GA 30334

bburton@law.ga.gov
(404) 656-3499
Party name: Stephen Upton, Warden

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543