Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 09-291
RSS Feed Print Notify MeSearch documents in this case:
No. 09-291
Title:Eric L. Thompson, Petitioner
v.
North American Stainless, LP
Docketed:September 8, 2009
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Sixth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(07-5040)
   Decision Date:June 5, 2009
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Sep 03 2009Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due October 8, 2009)
Oct 02 2009Order extending time to file response to petition to and including November 9, 2009.
Nov 09 2009Brief of respondent North American Stainless, LP in opposition filed.
Nov 17 2009DISTRIBUTED for Conference of December 4, 2009.
Nov 24 2009DISTRIBUTED for Conference of December 11, 2009.
Nov 24 2009Reply of petitioner Eric L. Thompson filed. (Distributed)
Dec 14 2009The Solicitor General is invited to file a brief in this case expressing the views of the United States.
May 25 2010Brief amicus curiae of United States filed.
Jun 07 2010Supplemental brief of petitioner Eric L. Thompson filed. (Distributed)
Jun 08 2010DISTRIBUTED for Conference of June 24, 2010.
Jul 20 2010Consent to the filing of amicus briefs, in support of either party or of neither party, received from counsel for the respondent.
Jul 24 2010Consent to the filing of amicus briefs, in support of either party or of neither party, received from counsel for the petitioner.
Jul 28 2010The time to file the joint appendix and petitioner's brief on the merits is extended to and including September 3, 2010.
Jul 28 2010The time within which to file respondent's brief on the merits is extended to and including October 22, 2010.
Sep 03 2010Joint appendix filed. (Statement of costs filed)
Sep 03 2010Brief of petitioner Eric L. Thompson filed.
Sep 07 2010SET FOR ARGUMENT Tuesday, December 7, 2010.
Sep 07 2010Justice Kagan is recused in this case.
Sep 10 2010Brief amicus curiae of United States filed.
Sep 10 2010Brief amici curiae of National Employment Lawyers Association, et al. filed.
Sep 10 2010Brief amici curiae of National Women's Law Center, et al. filed.
Sep 27 2010CIRCULATED
Sep 27 2010Record received from U.S.C.A. for Sixth Circuit. (1 box)
Oct 22 2010Brief of respondent North American Stainless, LP filed. (Distributed)
Oct 27 2010Motion of the Acting Solicitor General for leave to participate in oral argument as amicus curiae and for divided argument filed.
Oct 29 2010Brief amicus curiae of Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America filed. (Distributed)
Oct 29 2010Brief amici curiae of Equal Employment Advisory Council, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Nov 15 2010Motion of the Acting Solicitor General for leave to participate in oral argument as amicus curiae and for divided argument GRANTED. Justice Kagan took no part in the consideration or decision of this motion.
Nov 22 2010Record ffrom U.S.D.C. for Eastern District of Kentucky (Frankfort) is electronic.
Nov 22 2010Reply of petitioner Eric L. Thompson filed. (Distributed)
Dec 07 2010Argued. For petitioner: Eric Schnapper, Seattle, Wash.; and Leondra R. Kruger, Acting Principal Deputy Solicitor General, Department of Justice, Washington, D. C. (for United States, as amicus curiae.) For respondent: Leigh Gross Latherow, Ashland, Ky.
Jan 24 2011Judgment REVERSED and case REMANDED. Scalia, J., delivered the opinion of the Court, in which all other Members joined, except Kagan, J., who took no part in the consideration or decision of the case. Ginsburg, J., filed a concurring opinion, in which Breyer, J., joined.
Feb 25 2011JUDGMENT ISSUED.
May 10 2011Record returned to U.S.C.A. for 6th Circuit.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Eric Schnapper
    Counsel of Record
University of Washington
School of Law
P.O. Box 353020
Seattle, WA 98195

schnapp@uw.edu
(206) 616-3167
Party name: Eric L. Thompson
Attorneys for Respondent
Leigh Gross Latherow
    Counsel of Record
VanAntwerp, Monge, Jones, Edwards & McCann, LLP
P.O. Box 1111
Ashland, KY 41105

llatherow@vmje.com
(606) 329-2929
Party name: North American Stainless, LP
Other
Michael ForemanCivil Rights Appellate Clinic
Dickinson School of Law
Pennsylvania State University
Lewis Katz Building 121B
University Park, PA 16802

mlf25@psu.edu
(814) 865-3832
Party name: National Lawyers Employment Lawyers Association, et al.
Neal Kumar KatyalActing Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, N.W.
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ
(202) 514-2217
Party name: United States
Leondra Reid KrugerAssistant to the Solicitor General
Department of Justice
Washington, DC 20530

(202)-514-4038
Party name: Eric L. Thompson v. North American Stainless, LP
Patricia A. MillettAkin, Gump, Strauss, Hauer & Feld LLP
1333 New Hampshire Avenue, N.W.
Washington, DC 20036-1564

pmillett@akingump.com
(202) 887-4000
Party name: Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America
Helen NortonUniversity of Colorado School of Law
UCB 401
Wolf Law Building
Boulder, CO 80309

Helen.Norton@Colorado.edu
(303) 492-5751
Party name: National Women's Law Center, et al.
Rae T. VannNT Lakis, LLP
1501 M Street, N.W.
Suite 400
Washington, DC 20005

rvann@ntlakis.com
(202) 629-5600
Party name: Equal Employment Advisory Council, et al.

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543