Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 24-79
RSS Feed Print Notify MeSearch documents in this case:
No. 24-79
Title:James W. A. Jackson, Petitioner
v.
Kelly K. Fitzgerald
Docketed:July 25, 2024
Lower Ct:Supreme Court of Rhode Island
   Case Numbers:(2022-265)
   Decision Date:February 9, 2024
   Rehearing Denied:April 19, 2024
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Jul 18 2024Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due August 26, 2024)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 11 2024DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 9/30/2024.
Oct 07 2024Petition DENIED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
James W.A. Jackson81 Balaka Drive
Carlingford,NSW Australia, XX 2118

jjackson_1972@yahoo.com
(61) 419695049
Party name: James Jackson

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543