Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 24-752
RSS Feed Print Notify MeSearch documents in this case:
No. 24-752
Title:Paul Thomas, Petitioner
v.
Kathleen Harder, et al.
Docketed:January 15, 2025
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(23-35456)
   Decision Date:October 4, 2024
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Jan 02 2025Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due February 14, 2025)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 16 2025Waiver of right of respondent Kathleen Harder to respond filed.
Main Document
Feb 11 2025Brief amicus curiae of Association of American Physicians and Surgeons filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Feb 13 2025Brief amicus curiae of National Health Federation filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Feb 14 2025Brief amicus curiae of Informed Consent Action Network filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Feb 14 2025Brief amici curiae of America's Frontline Doctors, et al. filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Feb 26 2025DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 3/21/2025.
Mar 24 2025Petition DENIED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Stephen J. Joncus
    Counsel of Record
Joncus Law P.C.
13203 SE 172nd Ave Ste 166 #344
Happy Valley, OR 97086

steve@joncus.net
9712361200
Party name: Paul Thomas
Attorneys for Respondent
Benjamin Noah Gutman
    Counsel of Record
Oregon Department of Justice
1162 Court Street NE
Salem, OR 97301

benjamin.gutman@doj.oregon.gov
503-378-4402
Party name: Kathleen Harder
Other
Elizabeth Ann Brehm
    Counsel of Record
Siri & Glimstad LLP
745 Fifth Avenue, Suite 500
New York, NY 10151

ebrehm@sirillp.com
8887474529
Party name: Informed Consent Action Network
David Anthony Dalia
    Counsel of Record
David A. Dalia
Attorney at Law
700 Camp Street
New Orleans, LA 70130

davidadalia@gmail.com
504-524-5541
Party name: America's Frontline Doctors and Dr. Simone Gold, M.D., J.D.
Gregory James Glaser
    Counsel of Record
Greg Glaser, Attorney at Law
4399 Buckboard Drive, #423
Copperopolis, CA 95228

greg@gregglaser.com
(925) 642-6651
Party name: National Health Federation
Andrew L. Schlafly
    Counsel of Record
939 Old Chester Road
Far Hills, NJ 07931

aschlafly@aol.com
908-719-8608
Party name: Association of American Physicians and Surgeons

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543