SEARCH TIPS
Search term too short
Invalid text in search term. Try again
ADVANCED SEARCH
DOCKET SEARCH
Search
Toggle navigation
OPINIONS
Opinions of the Court
Opinions Relating to Orders
In-Chambers Opinions
U. S. Reports
Online Sources Cited in Opinions
Media Files Cited in Opinions
Case Citation Finder
FILING & RULES
Electronic Filing
Rules and Guidance
Supreme Court Bar
ORAL ARGUMENTS
Argument Transcripts
Argument Audio
Calendars and Lists
Courtroom Seating
CASE DOCUMENTS
Docket Search
Orders of the Court
Orders by Circuit
Granted/Noted Cases List
Journal
NEWS MEDIA
Services for News Media
Press Releases
Media Advisories
Press Credentials
Speeches
A Reporter's Guide to Applications
Chief Justice's Year-End Reports on the Federal Judiciary
ABOUT
Justices
Supreme Court at Work
Code of Conduct for Justices
History and Traditions
The Supreme Court Building
Building Regulations
Frequently Asked Questions
VISIT
Hours & Directions
Prohibited Items
Visitor Guidelines
Accessibility
Maps & Guides
Courtroom Lectures
Exhibitions
Group Visits
Activities for Students & Families
Café & Building Amenities
Home
>
Search Results
Docket for 24-1085
Search documents in this case:
Search
No. 24-1085
Title:
David P. Demarest, Petitioner
v.
Town of Underhill, Vermont, et al.
Docketed:
April 17, 2025
Lower Ct:
United States Court of Appeals for the Second Circuit
Case Numbers:
(24-147)
Decision Date:
January 14, 2025
Rehearing Denied:
Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Date
Proceedings and Orders
Apr 14 2025
Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due May 19, 2025)
Petition
Certificate of Word Count
Proof of Service
Apr 17 2025
Waiver of right of respondent Underhill, VT, et al. to respond filed.
Main Document
Apr 23 2025
DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 5/15/2025.
NAME
ADDRESS
PHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Michael M. Berger
Counsel of Record
Manatt, Phelps & Phillips, LLP
2049 Century Park East
Suite 1700
Los Angeles, CA 90067
MMBERGER@MANATT.COM
(310) 312-4185
Party name: David P. Demarest
Attorneys for Respondents
Kevin Louis Kite
Counsel of Record
Carroll, Boe & Kite, P.C.
64 Court Street
Middlebury, VT 05753
kkite@64court.com
802-388-6711
Party name: Underhill, VT, et al.
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
##LOC[Cancel]##
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
##LOC[Cancel]##