SEARCH TIPS
Search term too short
Invalid text in search term. Try again
ADVANCED SEARCH
DOCKET SEARCH
Search
Toggle navigation
OPINIONS
Opinions of the Court
Opinions Relating to Orders
In-Chambers Opinions
U. S. Reports
Online Sources Cited in Opinions
Media Files Cited in Opinions
Case Citation Finder
FILING & RULES
Electronic Filing
Rules and Guidance
Supreme Court Bar
ORAL ARGUMENTS
Argument Transcripts
Argument Audio
Calendars and Lists
Courtroom Seating
CASE DOCUMENTS
Docket Search
Orders of the Court
Orders by Circuit
Granted/Noted Cases List
Journal
NEWS MEDIA
Services for News Media
Press Releases
Media Advisories
Press Credentials
Speeches
A Reporter's Guide to Applications
Chief Justice's Year-End Reports on the Federal Judiciary
ABOUT
Justices
Supreme Court at Work
Code of Conduct for Justices
History and Traditions
The Supreme Court Building
Building Regulations
Frequently Asked Questions
VISIT
Hours & Directions
Prohibited Items
Visitor Guidelines
Accessibility
Maps & Guides
Courtroom Lectures
Exhibitions
Group Visits
Activities for Students & Families
Café & Building Amenities
Home
>
Search Results
Docket for 24-1007
Search documents in this case:
Search
No. 24-1007
Title:
Thomas J. Ayers, Petitioner
v.
Joseph Markiewicz, et al.
Docketed:
March 20, 2025
Lower Ct:
United States Court of Appeals for the Fourth Circuit
Case Numbers:
(24-1541)
Decision Date:
October 15, 2024
Rehearing Denied:
Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Date
Proceedings and Orders
Jan 13 2025
Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due April 21, 2025)
Petition
Appendix
Certificate of Word Count
Proof of Service
Mar 24 2025
Waiver of right of respondent Amway Corporation to respond filed.
Main Document
Apr 21 2025
Brief of respondents Joseph Markiewicz, et al. in opposition filed.
Main Document
Certificate of Word Count
Proof of Service
May 06 2025
DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 5/22/2025.
NAME
ADDRESS
PHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Thomas J. Ayers
7447 Marrisey Loop
Galena, OH 43021
judayers@protonmail.com
(614) 940-2074
Party name: Thomas Ayers
Attorneys for Respondents
Daniel Stephen Brookins
Counsel of Record
Warner Norcross + Judd
150 Ottawa Ave. NW, Suite 1500
Grand Rapids, MI 49503
dbrookins@wnj.com
616-752-2599
Party name: Amway Corporation
Luke Andrew Dalton
Counsel of Record
McAngus Goudelock & Courie PLLC
4130 Parklake Avenue, Suite 550
Raleigh, NC 27612
luke.dalton@mgclaw.com
919-719-8204
Party name: Douglas Weir
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
##LOC[Cancel]##
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
##LOC[Cancel]##