Docket for 21-417
 | | No. 21-417
| Title: | Sulzer Mixpac AG, Petitioner v. A&N Trading Company, et al. | Docketed: | September 16, 2021 | | | Lower Ct: | United States Court of Appeals for the Second Circuit | Case Numbers: | (19-2951) | Decision Date: | February 18, 2021 | Rehearing Denied: | May 6, 2021 | Discretionary Court Decision Date: | | | | |
|
Sep 16 2021 | Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due October 18, 2021) | | PetitionCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | Oct 18 2021 | Brief amicus curiae of the International Trademark Association filed. | | Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | Oct 18 2021 | Brief amici curiae of Intellectual Property Law Professors filed. | | Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | Oct 18 2021 | Brief amici curiae of International Anticounterfeiting Coalition, et al. filed. | | Main DocumentProof of ServiceProof of Service | Oct 21 2021 | Letter of petitioner Sulzer Mixpac AG pertaining to Rule 29.6 filed. | | Main DocumentProof of Service | Nov 02 2021 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 11/19/2021. | | | Nov 08 2021 | Response Requested. (Due December 8, 2021) | | | Dec 02 2021 | Motion to extend the time to file a response from December 8, 2021 to January 7, 2022, submitted to The Clerk. | | Main DocumentProof of Service | Dec 03 2021 | Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including January 7, 2022. | | | Jan 06 2022 | Motion to extend the time to file a response from January 7, 2022 to February 7, 2022, submitted to The Clerk. | | Main DocumentProof of Service | Jan 06 2022 | Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including February 7, 2022. | | | Feb 07 2022 | Brief of respondents A&N Trading Company, et al. in opposition filed. | | Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count | Feb 22 2022 | Reply of petitioner Sulzer Mixpac AG filed. (Distributed) | | Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | Feb 23 2022 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 3/18/2022. | | | Mar 21 2022 | Petition DENIED. | | |
|