Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 21-1448
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 21-1448
Title:Dustin Jade Wells, Petitioner
v.
Kathleen A. McCallister
Docketed:May 16, 2022
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(20-35984)
   Decision Date:December 3, 2021
   Rehearing Denied:February 11, 2022
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
May 12 2022Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due June 15, 2022)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jun 09 2022Waiver of right of respondent Kathleen A. McCallister to respond filed.
Main Document
Jun 17 2022Motion for leave to file amicus brief filed by Central District Consumer Bankruptcy Attorneys Association.
Main DocumentMain DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Amanda Kelly Rice
    Counsel of Record
Jones Day
150 W. Jefferson Ave.
Suite 2100
Detroit, MI 48226

arice@jonesday.com
(313) 733-3939
Party name: Dustin Jade Wells
Attorneys for Respondent
Kathleen McCallisterKathleen McCallister, Chapter 13 Trustee
P.O. Box 1150
Meridan, ID 83642

208-922-5100
Party name: Kathleen A. McCallister
Other
Matthew David Resnik
    Counsel of Record
RHM LAW, LLP
17609 Ventura Blvd., Suite 314
Encino, CA 91316

matt@rhmfirm.com
8182850100
Party name: Central District Consumer Bankruptcy Attorneys Association

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543