Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 17-857
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 17-857
Title:In Re Larry Shane, et al., Petitioners
Docketed:December 15, 2017
Lower Ct:
   Case Numbers:
   Decision Date:
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Nov 20 2017Petition for a writ of mandamus filed. (Response due January 16, 2018)
PetitionProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Jan 31 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 2/16/2018.
Feb 20 2018Petition DENIED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Neil Kenneth Evans
    Counsel of Record
Retired from Hahn Loeser & Parks
c/o Neil K Evans
3230 South Green Road
Beachwood, OH 44122

nkevanslaw@gmail.com
(216) 751-8201
Party name: Larry Shane, et al.

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543