Docket for 17-754
|
Nov 16 2017 | Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due December 21, 2017) | | | Dec 11 2017 | Waiver of right of respondents Philip Marcus, et al. to respond filed. | | Main Document | Dec 20 2017 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/5/2018. | | | Jan 08 2018 | Petition DENIED. | | |
|