SEARCH TIPS
Search term too short
Invalid text in search term. Try again
ADVANCED SEARCH
DOCKET SEARCH
Search
Toggle navigation
OPINIONS
Opinions of the Court
Opinions Relating to Orders
In-Chambers Opinions
U. S. Reports
Online Sources Cited in Opinions
Media Files Cited in Opinions
Case Citation Finder
FILING & RULES
Electronic Filing
Rules and Guidance
Supreme Court Bar
ORAL ARGUMENTS
Argument Transcripts
Argument Audio
Calendars and Lists
Courtroom Seating
CASE DOCUMENTS
Docket Search
Orders of the Court
Orders by Circuit
Granted/Noted Cases List
Journal
NEWS MEDIA
Services for News Media
Press Releases
Media Advisories
Press Credentials
Speeches
A Reporter's Guide to Applications
Chief Justice's Year-End Reports on the Federal Judiciary
ABOUT THE COURT
Justices
Supreme Court at Work
Code of Conduct for Justices
History and Traditions
The Supreme Court Building
Visiting the Court
Activities for Students & Families
Exhibitions
Building Regulations
Frequently Asked Questions
Home
>
Search Results
47 items found. Page: 1 of 7 for your search: masterpiece
<< First
< Previous
Next >
Last >>
Search Results:
16-111 Masterpiece Cakeshop, Ltd. v. Colorado Civil Rights Comm'n (06/04/2018)
SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES Syllabus
MASTERPIECE
CAKESHOP, LTD., ET AL. v. COLORADO CIVIL No. 16–111. Argued December 5, 2017—Decided June 4, 2018
Masterpiece
Cakeshop, Ltd., is a Colorado
Media Advisory - 10/31/17c - Supreme Court of the United States
Chief Justice's Year-End Reports on the Federal Judiciary Press seats will be reserved for the oral argument in the following case: Scheduled Tuesday, December 5, 2017, 10 a.m.
19-123-12.pdf
ceremony. She said she called Phillips’
Masterpiece
Cakeshop to place the order after hearing about forward with the cases.Jack Phillips in
Masterpiece
Cakeshop in Lakewood (credit: Matthew Staver/For
16-111-1.pdf
AM 6/1/2018, 9:02 Wedding |
MASTERPIECE
CAKESHOP http://masterpiececakes.com/wedding-cakes/1 of 2 AM 6/1/2018, 9:02 Wedding |
MASTERPIECE
CAKESHOP http://masterpiececakes.com/wedding-cakes/2 of 2
QPReport
16-111
MASTERPIECE
CAKESHOP V. CO CIVIL RIGHTS COMMISSION DECISION BELOW: 370 P.3d 272 CERT. GRANTED
Granted & Noted List - October Term 2017
Chief Justice's Year-End Reports on the Federal Judiciary SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 16-111 CSX
MASTERPIECE
CAKESHOP, LTD. V. COLORADO CIVIL RIGHTS COMM N
Granted & Noted List October Term 2017 (As of 06/28/2018)
Sotomayor (C) Result: AFFIRMED 16-111 CSX
MASTERPIECE
CAKESHOP, LTD. V. COLORADO CIVIL RIGHTS COMM’N
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
##LOC[Cancel]##
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
##LOC[Cancel]##