SEARCH TIPS
Search term too short
Invalid text in search term. Try again
ADVANCED SEARCH
DOCKET SEARCH
Search
Toggle navigation
OPINIONS
Opinions of the Court
Opinions Relating to Orders
In-Chambers Opinions
U. S. Reports
Online Sources Cited in Opinions
Media Files Cited in Opinions
Case Citation Finder
FILING & RULES
Electronic Filing
Rules and Guidance
Supreme Court Bar
ORAL ARGUMENTS
Argument Transcripts
Argument Audio
Calendars and Lists
Courtroom Seating
CASE DOCUMENTS
Docket Search
Orders of the Court
Orders by Circuit
Granted/Noted Cases List
Journal
NEWS MEDIA
Services for News Media
Press Releases
Media Advisories
Press Credentials
Speeches
A Reporter's Guide to Applications
Chief Justice's Year-End Reports on the Federal Judiciary
ABOUT
Justices
Supreme Court at Work
Code of Conduct for Justices
History and Traditions
The Supreme Court Building
Building Regulations
Frequently Asked Questions
VISIT
Hours & Directions
Prohibited Items
Visitor Guidelines
Accessibility
Maps & Guides
Courtroom Lectures
Exhibitions
Group Visits
Activities for Students & Families
Café & Building Amenities
Home
>
Search Results
42 items found. Page: 1 of 6 for your search: honeycutt
<< First
< Previous
Next >
Last >>
Search Results:
581bv.pdf
19-16 Peithman v. United States (11/18/2019)
id., at 10 (“[T]he government has agreed that
Honeycutt’s
reasoningapplies to Section 981(a)(1)(C the Government now concedes that the rationale of
Honeycutt
applies equally to §981(a)(1)(C) as it
QPReport
16-142
HONEYCUTT
V. UNITED STATES DECISION BELOW: 816 F2d 362 CERT. GRANTED 12/9/2016 QUESTION
Miscellaneous Order (12/09/2016)
U.S.) FRIDAY, DECEMBER 9, 2016 CERTIORARI GRANTED 16-142
HONEYCUTT
, TERRY M. V. UNITED STATES The
Day Call, Wednesday, March 29, 2017
D. C. No. 16-142. (5) TERRY MICHAEL
HONEYCUTT
, Petitioner V. 1 hour for argument. MR. BRIAN H
Granted & Noted List October Term 2016 (As of June 26, 2017)
SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES GRANTED & NOTED LIST CASES FOR ARGUMENT IN OCTOBER TERM 2016 As of June 26, 2017 14-1055* CFX LIGHTFOOT V. CENDANT MORTGAGE CORP. Court: USCA-9 Granted: 6/28/16
Monthly Argument Calendar March 2017
STATES (Consolidated – 1 hr. for argument) (5)
HONEYCUTT
V. UNITED STATES Court convenes at 10 a.m.
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
##LOC[Cancel]##
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
##LOC[Cancel]##