SEARCH TIPS
Search term too short
Invalid text in search term. Try again
ADVANCED SEARCH
DOCKET SEARCH
Search
Toggle navigation
OPINIONS
Opinions of the Court
Opinions Relating to Orders
In-Chambers Opinions
U. S. Reports
Online Sources Cited in Opinions
Media Files Cited in Opinions
Case Citation Finder
FILING & RULES
Electronic Filing
Rules and Guidance
Supreme Court Bar
ORAL ARGUMENTS
Argument Transcripts
Argument Audio
Calendars and Lists
Courtroom Seating
CASE DOCUMENTS
Docket Search
Orders of the Court
Orders by Circuit
Granted/Noted Cases List
Journal
NEWS MEDIA
Services for News Media
Press Releases
Media Advisories
Press Credentials
Speeches
A Reporter's Guide to Applications
Chief Justice's Year-End Reports on the Federal Judiciary
ABOUT
Justices
Supreme Court at Work
Code of Conduct for Justices
History and Traditions
The Supreme Court Building
Building Regulations
Frequently Asked Questions
VISIT
Hours & Directions
Prohibited Items
Visitor Guidelines
Accessibility
Maps & Guides
Courtroom Lectures
Exhibitions
Group Visits
Activities for Students & Families
Café & Building Amenities
Home
>
Search Results
500+ items found for your search:
Louisiana v. Callais
Page: 1 of 72
<< First
< Previous
Next >
Last >>
Search Results:
23A994 Robinson v. Callais (05/15/2024)
seriesof cases about what district lines
Louisiana
voters should use to select their Congressional Representatives. Over 2 ROBINSON
v
.
CALLAIS
JACKSON, J., dissenting more than two
21A539 Louisiana v. American Rivers (04/06/2022)
because they have failed to substan2
LOUISIANA
v
. AMERICAN RIVERS KAGAN, J., dissenting tiate their normal order is justified only“rarely.” Heckler
v
. Lopez, 463 U. S. 1328, 1330 (1983) (Rehnquist, J
Monthly Argument Calendar March 2025
March 24, 2025 Monday, March 24 (1) 24-109)
LOUISIANA
V
.
CALLAIS
24-110) ROBINSON
V
.
CALLAIS
(Consolidated -1 hr. for argument) (2) 23-1270 RILEY
V
. BONDI
21-993 Anthony v. Louisiana (11/07/2022)
COURT OF THE UNITED STATES WILLARD ANTHONY
v
.
LOUISIANA
ON PETITION FOR WRIT OF CERTIORARI TO THE COURT OF APPEAL OF
LOUISIANA
, FIFTH CIRCUIT No. 21–993. Decided November 7, 2022 The petition
Home - Supreme Court of the United States
Chief Justice's Year-End Reports on the Federal Judiciary Feliciano
v
. Department Of Transportation (23-861 Advocate Christ Medical Center
v
. Kennedy (23-715 Monsalvo Velazquez
v
. Bondi (23-929
Argument Audio
OK Charter School Board
v
. Drummond
Louisiana
v
.
Callais
Catholic Charities Bureau
v
. WI Labor Review Comm'n Medina
v
. Planned Parenthood South Atlantic Ames
v
. OH Dept. of Youth Services
22-77 Brown v. Louisiana (04/03/2023)
SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES DAVID BROWN
v
.
LOUISIANA
ON PETITION FOR WRIT OF CERTIORARI TO THE SUPREME COURT OF
LOUISIANA
No. 22–77. Decided April 3, 2023 The motion of
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
##LOC[Cancel]##
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
##LOC[Cancel]##