Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 19-368
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 19-368
Title:Ford Motor Company, Petitioner
v.
Montana Eighth Judicial District Court, et al.
Docketed:September 19, 2019
Linked with 19A103
Lower Ct:Supreme Court of Montana
   Case Numbers:(OP 19-0099)
   Decision Date:May 21, 2019
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Jul 24 2019Application (19A103) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from August 19, 2019 to September 18, 2019, submitted to Justice Kagan.
Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsProof of Service
Jul 25 2019Application (19A103) granted by Justice Kagan extending the time to file until September 18, 2019.
Sep 18 2019Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due October 21, 2019)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 26 2019Blanket Consent filed by Petitioner, Ford Motor Company.
Blanket Consent
Oct 01 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response from October 21, 2019 to November 20, 2019, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Oct 04 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including November 20, 2019.
Oct 21 2019Brief amici curiae of The Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 21 2019Brief amicus curiae of The Alliance of Automobile Manufacturers filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 20 2019Brief of respondent Charles Lucero, personal representative of the Estate of Markkaya Jean Gullett in opposition filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 04 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/10/2020.
Dec 04 2019Reply of petitioner Ford Motor Company filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 13 2020DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/17/2020.
Jan 17 2020Petition GRANTED. The petition for a writ of certiorari in No. 19-369 is granted. The cases are consolidated, and a total of one hour is allotted for oral argument. VIDED.
Jan 17 2020Because the Court has consolidated these cases for briefing and oral argument, future filings and activity in the cases will now be reflected on the docket of No. 19-368. Subsequent filings in these cases must therefore be submitted through the electronic filing system in No. 19-368. Each document submitted in connection with one or more of these cases must include on its cover the case number and caption for each case in which the filing is intended to be submitted. Where a filing is submitted in fewer than all of the cases, the docket entry will reflect the case number(s) in which the filing is submitted; a document filed in all of the consolidated cases will be noted as “VIDED.”
Jan 27 2020Blanket Consent filed by Petitioner, Ford Motor Company.VIDED.
Blanket Consent
Feb 21 2020SET FOR ARGUMENT on Monday, April 27, 2020. VIDED.
Feb 26 2020Record requested from the Supreme Court of Montana.
Feb 28 2020Joint appendix filed (statement of costs filed). VIDED.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Feb 28 2020Brief of petitioner Ford Motor Company filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 04 2020The record of the Supreme Court of Montana is available on its' website (www.supremecourtdocket.mt.gov).
Mar 05 2020Brief amicus curiae of Product Liability Advisory Council, Inc. filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 06 2020Brief amicus curiae of Washington Legal Foundation filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 06 2020Brief amicus curiae of United States filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Mar 06 2020Brief amici curiae of The Alliance for Automobile Innovation, et al. filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 06 2020Brief amici curiae of The Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America, et al. filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 06 2020Brief amici curiae of Pharmaceutical Research and Manufacturers of America (PhRMA) filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 06 2020Brief amicus curiae of Institute of International Bankers filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 06 2020Brief amicus curiae of DRI - The Voice Of The Defense Bar filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 19 2020CIRCULATED
Mar 30 2020Motion of the Solicitor General for leave to participate in oral argument as amicus curiae and for divided argument filed. VIDED.
Proof of ServiceMain Document
Mar 30 2020Brief of respondents Charles Lucero, personal representative of the Estate of Markkaya Jean Gullett, et al. filed. VIDED. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Apr 02 2020Brief amicus curiae of Professor Jonathan R. Nash filed. VIDED. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Apr 02 2020Brief amicus curiae of Civil Procedure Professors filed. VIDED. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Apr 03 2020ORAL ARGUMENT POSTPONED. VIDED.
Apr 03 2020Brief amici curiae of Civil Procedure and Federal Courts Professors filed. VIDED. (Distributed)
Main DocumentOtherCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Apr 03 2020Brief amicus curiae of The Center for Auto Safety filed. VIDED. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Apr 06 2020Motion of Minnesota, et al. for leave to participate in oral argument as amici curiae and for divided argument filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Apr 06 2020Brief amici curiae of Professors of Jurisdiction filed. VIDED. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Apr 06 2020Brief amici curiae of Civil Procedure Professors Pamela K. Bookman, et al. filed. VIDED. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Apr 06 2020Brief amicus curiae of Foundation for Moral Law filed. VIDED. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Apr 06 2020Brief amicus curiae of National Association of Home Builders filed. VIDED. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Apr 06 2020Brief amicus curiae of Main Street Alliance filed. VIDED. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Apr 06 2020Brief amici curiae of American Association for Justice and Public Justice, P.C. filed. VIDED. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Apr 06 2020Brief amici curiae of Minnesota, Texas, 37 Other States and The District of Columbia filed. VIDED. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Apr 13 2020Argument to be rescheduled for the October Term 2020. VIDED.
Apr 20 2020Motion of the Solicitor General for leave to participate in oral argument as amicus curiae and for divided argument DENIED. VIDED.
Apr 20 2020Motion of Minnesota, et al. for leave to participate in oral argument as amici curiae and for divided argument DENIED. VIDED.
Apr 29 2020Reply of petitioner Ford Motor Company filed. VIDED. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 13 2020SET FOR ARGUMENT on Wednesday, October 7, 2020. VIDED.
Oct 07 2020Argued. For petitioner: Sean Marotta, Washington, D.C. For respondents: Deepak Gupta, Washington, D. C. VIDED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Sean Marotta
    Counsel of Record
Hogan Lovells US LLP
555 Thirteenth Street, N.W.
Washington, DC 20004

sean.marotta@hoganlovells.com
2026374881
Party name: Ford Motor Company
Attorneys for Respondents
Deepak Gupta
    Counsel of Record
Gupta Wessler PLLC
1900 L Street, NW
Suite 312
Washington, DC 20036

deepak@guptawessler.com
(202) 888-1741
Party name: Charles Lucero, personal representative of the Estate of Markkaya Jean Gullett, et al.
Other
Jeffrey B. Wall
    Counsel of Record
Acting Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States
Lisa Marie Baird
    Counsel of Record
Reed Smith LLP
1001 Brickell Bay Drive
9th Floor
Miami, FL 33131

lbaird@reedsmith.com
786.747.0220
Party name: DRI - The Voice Of The Defense Bar
Pamela Karten Bookman
    Counsel of Record
Fordham Law School
150 W. 62d St.
New York, NY 10023

pbookman@fordham.edu
9178414253
Party name: Civil Procedure Professors Pamela K. Bookman, et al.
Eric F. Citron
    Counsel of Record
Goldstein & Russell, P.C.
7475 Wisconsin Ave., Suite 850
Bethesda, MD 20814

ecitron@goldsteinrussell.com
(202) 362-0636
Party name: National Association of Home Builders
Larry E. Coben
    Counsel of Record
Anapol Weiss
8700 E. Vista Bonita Drive
Suite 268
Scottsdale, AZ 85255

lcoben@anapolweiss.com
480-515-4745
Party name: The Center for Auto Safety
David R. Geiger
    Counsel of Record
Foley Hoag LLP
Seaport West
155 Seaport Boulevard
Boston, MA 02210-2600

dgeiger@foleyhoag.com
6178321124
Party name: Product Liability Advisory Council, Inc.
Elizabeth Catherine Kramer
    Counsel of Record
Office of the Minnesota Attorney General
445 Minnesota Street
Suite 1100
Saint Paul, MN 55101

liz.kramer@ag.state.mn.us
651-757-1010
Party name: Minnesota, Texas, 37 Other States and The District of Columbia
Vincent Gregory Levy
    Counsel of Record
Holwell Shuster & Goldberg, LLP
425 Lexington Avenue, 14th Floor
New York, NY 10017

vlevy@hsgllp.com
646-837-5120
Party name: Professors of Jurisdiction
Elbert Lin
    Counsel of Record
Hunton Andrews Kurth LLP
951 E. Byrd Street
Riverfront Plaza, East Tower
Richmond, VA 23219-4074

elin@HuntonAK.com
804-788-7202
Party name: Institute of International Bankers
Alan B. Morrison
    Counsel of Record
George Washington Law School
2000 H Street NW
Washington, DC 20052

abmorrison@law.gwu.edu
2029947120
Party name: Civil Procedure Professors
Jonathan Remy Nash
    Counsel of Record
Emory University School of Law
1301 Clifton Road, NE
Atlanta, GA 30322

jnash4@emory.edu
404-712-1715
Party name: Professor Jonathan R. Nash
Robert S. Peck
    Counsel of Record
Center for Constitutional Litigation, PC
2117 Leroy Place, N.W.
Washington, DC 20008

robert.peck@cclfirm.com
2029442874
Party name: American Association for Justice and Public Justice, P.C.
Andrew John Pincus
    Counsel of Record
Mayer Brown LLP
1999 K Street, NW
Washington, DC 20006

apincus@mayerbrown.com
202-263-3220
Party name: The Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America, The National Association of Manufacturers, and The American Tort Reform Association
Amanda Kelly Rice
    Counsel of Record
Jones Day
150 W. Jefferson Ave., Suite 2100
Detroit, MI 48226

arice@jonesday.com
313-230-7926
Party name: Washington Legal Foundation
Jaime Ann Santos
    Counsel of Record
Goodwin Procter LLP
1900 N Street, NW
Washington, DC 20036

jsantos@goodwinlaw.com
2023464034
Party name: The Alliance of Automobile Manufacturers
Virginia Anne Seitz
    Counsel of Record
Sidley Austin LLP
1501 K Street, N.W.
Washington, DC 20005

vseitz@sidley.com
202-736-8000
Party name: Pharmaceutical Research and Manufacturers of America (PhRMA)
Linda Sandstrom Simard
    Counsel of Record
Suffolk University Law School
120 Tremont St
Boston, MA 02108

lsimard@suffolk.edu
6175738087
Party name: Civil Procedure and Federal Courts Professors
Martin Saul Wishnatsky
    Counsel of Record
Foundation for Moral Law
One Dexter Avenue
Montgomery, AL 36104

martin@morallaw.org
3343200382
Party name: Foundation for Moral Law
Hassan Ali Zavareei
    Counsel of Record
Tycko & Zavareei LLP
1828 L Street, NW, Suite 1000
Washington, DC 20036

hzavareei@tzlegal.com
202.973.0900
Party name: Main Street Alliance

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543