Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome | Search Results


Docket for 16A93
No. 16A93
Title:
Epic Systems Corporation, Applicant
v.
Jacob Lewis
Docketed:July 27, 2016
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Seventh Circuit
  Case Nos.:(15-2997)

~~~Date~~~ ~~~~~~~Proceedings  and  Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~
Jul 25 2016 Application (16A93) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from August 24, 2016 to September 23, 2016, submitted to Justice Kagan.
Jul 29 2016 Application (16A93) granted by Justice Kagan extending the time to file until September 23, 2016.



~~Name~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~    ~~~~~~~Address~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~   ~~Phone~~~
Attorneys for Petitioner:
Neal K. Katyal Hogan Lovells US LLP(202) 637-5600
    Counsel of Record555 Thirteenth Street, N.W.
Washington, DC  20004
Party name: Epic Systems Corporation
June 21, 2017 | Version 2014.2