Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome | Search Results


Docket for 16A823
No. 16A823
Title:
Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd., et al., Applicants
v.
Apple, Inc.
Docketed:February 17, 2017
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Federal Circuit
  Case Nos.:(15-1171, 15-1195, 15-1994)

~~~Date~~~ ~~~~~~~Proceedings  and  Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~
Feb 17 2017 Application (16A823) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from February 26, 2017 to March 29, 2017, submitted to The Chief Justice.
Feb 21 2017 Application (16A823) granted by The Chief Justice extending the time to file until March 29, 2017.



~~Name~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~    ~~~~~~~Address~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~   ~~Phone~~~
Attorneys for Petitioners:
Kathleen M. Sullivan Quinn Emanuel Urquhart & Sullivan, LLP(212) 849-7000
    Counsel of Record51 Madison Ave., 22nd Floor
New York, NY  10010
Party name: Samsung Electronics Co., et al.
April 28, 2017 | Version 2014.2